Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 905 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1805 Week
» 13626 Month
» 182398 Year
» 1066779 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 378 m/e 05/1903
BR 30378 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1903
Withdrawal Sun 30/12/1962
Scrapping During 04/1963
Service Life 59 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70C Guildford 6w/e 14/06/1959
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 02/1962
   Withdrawn 30/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 31/07/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 02/04/1962
WDN   30/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 378
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30378    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
30/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30378    

prev prev