Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2088 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19891 Week
» 72907 Month
» 192434 Year
» 3219287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
449 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
British Railways |
30449 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
06/1925 |
SIR TORRE |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 06/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/12/1959 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1925 |
SAL |
|
Salisbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
72B |
Salisbury |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
REINS |
72B |
Salisbury |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
TOSTORE |
72B |
Salisbury |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
REINS |
72B |
Salisbury |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
Locomotives ex Works in late September included: Nos. 35018/25 painted blue, Nos. 30449, 30741, 34061 painted dark green, Nos. 30323, 30730/32, 30905, 32077/86 painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 30458 Ironside, 30840/42, 32085, 90772 are unlined black. In addition to the above, Nos. 35009/17 are painted blue and Nos. 34091-92 are very dark green. |
SLS/194911 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 449, name: SIR TORRE Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30449 |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30449 |
|
|