Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 356 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4094 Week
» 1607 Month
» 229491 Year
» 1451056 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 457 m/e 04/1925
BR 30457 m/e 08/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1925 SIR BEDIVERE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Urie / R. Maunsell
Class King Arthur
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/05/1961
Scrapping During 07/1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1925
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948
72B Salisbury 4w/e 08/12/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
70B Feltham 4w/e 11/04/1951
72B Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951
70A Nine Elms 7w/e 27/06/1951
70D Basingstoke 7w/e 08/10/1957
70A Nine Elms q/e 06/06/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 20/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAS Basingstoke 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 6w/e 26/09/1949
REINS 72B Salisbury 3w/e 10/06/1950
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 08/01/1953
REINS 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 06/06/1958
WDN   w/e 20/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 457, name: SIR BEDIVERE
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30457    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
20/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30457    

prev prev