Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4061 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22972 Week
» 87926 Month
» 290590 Year
» 3317443 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
477 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
British Railways |
30477 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie |
Class |
H15 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 05/1924 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/07/1959 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/07/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/04/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. |
SLS/195106 |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 477 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30477 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30477 |
|
|
08/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|