Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 898 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1798 Week
» 13619 Month
» 182391 Year
» 1066772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 481 m/e 11/1911
BR 30481 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 11/1911
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/05/1959
Scrapping During 06/1959
Service Life 47 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 20/03/1951
71A Eastleigh 7w/e 27/06/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 30/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 27/06/1951
WDN   w/e 30/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1911 To Service To service as SR Number 481
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30481    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30481    

prev prev