Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 817 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14223 Week
» 67239 Month
» 186766 Year
» 3213619 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
483 |
m/e |
04/1914 |
British Railways |
30483 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie |
Class |
H15 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 04/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/06/1957 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1914 |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70A |
|
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 483 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30483 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
06/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
22/06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30483 |
|
|