Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 506 m/e 10/1920
BR 30506 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Urie / R. Maunsell
Class S15
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 10/1920
Withdrawal Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 43 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FEL Feltham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as SR Number 506
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30506    
20/07/1954 Sightings Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30506    

prev prev