Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 337 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18140 Week
» 71156 Month
» 190683 Year
» 3217536 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
523 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
British Railways |
30523 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie |
Class |
H15 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 09/1924 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/12/1961 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1924 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70A |
|
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
72B |
|
Salisbury |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
P |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 523 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30523 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30523 |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|