Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2272 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20075 Week
» 73091 Month
» 192618 Year
» 3219471 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
3167 |
m/e |
05/1883 |
British Railways |
30570 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
Jumbos |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 05/1883 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/12/1956 |
Service Life |
73 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1883 |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/12/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/12/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1948 |
General |
Locomotives with smokebox number plates include: Nos. 30193, 30521/70, 30696, 30856/61, 30950, 32095, 34012/18. |
SLS/194808 |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 3167 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30570 |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30570 |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|