Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 259 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7329 Week
» 4437 Month
» 111383 Year
» 1332948 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 3439 m/e 05/1883
BR 30575 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Adams
Class Jumbos
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 05/1883
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/12/1958
Scrapping During 01/1959
Service Life 75 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 11/12/1952
70C Guildford 4w/e 11/12/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 13/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 11/12/1952
TOSTORE   5w/e 24/08/1953
REINS 70C Guildford 4w/e 11/12/1954
WDN   w/e 13/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1883 To Service To service as SR Number 3439
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30575    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 30575    

prev prev