Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
3506 |
m/e |
12/1885 |
British Railways |
30580 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
Jumbos |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 12/1885 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1957 |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
REINS |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops 49, 30352, 30416/54/99, 30501/35/89, 30580 (ex 3506), 698, 30744/51/69, 30864, 30936/56, 32094, 32347, 32608, 34025/9/54/9/61/7/96/7/8. For shops 34055, 35010. Ex shops 30766/72, 34100 (dark green), 30484 (lined black), 30571 (ex 3397), 30306. Scrap: 30122, 154, 408. Noted un-renumbered: 246, 1432. No. 769 had just been renumbered. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1885 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 3506 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30580 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30580 |
|
|
06/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|