Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1003 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5577 Week
» 33535 Month
» 68177 Year
» 1289742 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 667 m/e 09/1897
BR 30667 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 09/1897
Withdrawal During 02/1961
Scrapping During 02/1961
Service Life 63 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 13/11/1950
72B Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951
70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 10/12/1953
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 08/02/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1961
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 19/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill 10w/e 10/12/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 08/02/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1897 To Service To service as SR Number 667
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30667    
13/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
10/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30667    
19/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    

prev prev