Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 1029 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5603 Week
» 33561 Month
» 68203 Year
» 1289768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 670 m/e 10/1897
BR 30670 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 10/1897
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/02/1963
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 65 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BPL Barnstaple Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72B Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951
72E Barnstaple Junction 2w/e 10/10/1961
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1897 To Service To service as SR Number 670
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barnstaple Junction (BPL)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 30670    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
10/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
09/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30670    

prev prev