Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 683 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4199 Week
» 32157 Month
» 66799 Year
» 1288364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 671 m/e 10/1897
BR 30671 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 10/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/07/1959
Scrapping During 08/1959
Service Life 61 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 15/06/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 11/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 16/09/1955
REINS 72E Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 11/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1897 To Service To service as SR Number 671
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30671    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30671    

prev prev