Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 577 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 577 Week
» 18898 Month
» 107090 Year
» 991471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 675 m/e 11/1897
BR 30675 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 11/1897
Withdrawal During 03/1958
Scrapping During 03/1958
Service Life 60 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70C Guildford 4w/e 08/01/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 08/01/1953
WDN   w/e 22/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1897 To Service To service as SR Number 675
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30675    
08/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 30675    

prev prev