|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/10/1959 | Eastleigh MPD (On shed ex-Works) | On shed ex-Works:- 30519/692; on shed out of use:- 30117, 30287/9/300/782/5, 31735, 32101/510/76, 32677. | SLS/195912 |
25/02/1962 | Eastleigh Works (Behind Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1897 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 692 Built at Dübs & Co |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) | ||
07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30692 | ||
11/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) | ||
03/02/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30692 | ||
03/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |