Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 917 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14323 Week
» 67339 Month
» 186866 Year
» 3213719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
696 |
m/e |
03/1897 |
British Railways |
30696 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Black Motors |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 03/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/08/1961 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1897 |
BM |
|
Bournemouth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
3w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/08/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FEL |
Feltham |
3w/e |
31/12/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1948 |
General |
Locomotives with smokebox number plates include: Nos. 30193, 30521/70, 30696, 30856/61, 30950, 32095, 34012/18. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 696 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30696 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30696 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|