Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 129 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4944 Week
» 11078 Month
» 238962 Year
» 1460527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 702 m/e 01/1899
BR 30702 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/10/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 60 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1899
YEO Yeovil Town 01/01/1948
72B Salisbury 9w/e 30/06/1952
72A Exmouth Junction w/e 11/03/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 24/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 3w/e 28/05/1949
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 72B Salisbury m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE 72B Salisbury 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 72B Salisbury 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 72B Salisbury 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 72B Salisbury w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 12/01/1959
WDN   w/e 24/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 702
Built at Dübs & Co
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yeovil Town (YEO)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30702    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
24/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30702    

prev prev