Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1115 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5689 Week
» 33647 Month
» 68289 Year
» 1289854 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 704 m/e 01/1899
BR 30704 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal Sat 06/10/1951
Scrapping During 10/1951
Service Life 52 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951
   Withdrawn 06/10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/06/1948
TOSTORE BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC YEO Yeovil Town 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/02/1951
LOAN 72C Yeovil Town 12/05/1951
WDN   06/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 704
Built at Dübs & Co
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30704    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 30704    

prev prev