Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1030 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5604 Week
» 33562 Month
» 68204 Year
» 1289769 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 705 m/e 01/1899
BR 30705 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal Tue 14/01/1958
Scrapping During 02/1958
Service Life 59 yrs , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ELH Eastleigh 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 08/12/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951
70C Guildford 3w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 14/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh m/e 30/06/1947
TOSTORE 72B Salisbury 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE 72B Salisbury 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 70D Basingstoke w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 31/10/1956
WDN   w/e 11/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 705
Built at Dübs & Co
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30705    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
14/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 30705    

prev prev