Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 645 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4161 Week
» 32119 Month
» 66761 Year
» 1288326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 706 m/e 01/1899
BR 30706 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/05/1959
Scrapping During 07/1959
Service Life 60 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAS Basingstoke 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/06/1949
72A Exmouth Junction (Reinstated) 4w/e 17/06/1950
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 11/12/1954
   Withdrawn w/e 23/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/06/1949
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/07/1950
WDN   06/10/1951
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town w/e 06/12/1951
TOSTORE 72C Yeovil Town 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 11/03/1955
WDN   w/e 23/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 706
Built at Dübs & Co
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS)    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (YEO)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30706    
17/06/1950 Reinstated Reinstated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30706    

prev prev