Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1119 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5693 Week
» 33651 Month
» 68293 Year
» 1289858 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 707 m/e 06/1899
BR 30707 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 06/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/03/1961
Scrapping During 05/1961
Service Life 61 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ELH Eastleigh 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 30/06/1949
70D Basingstoke 9w/e 30/06/1952
72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 07/10/1952
72C Yeovil Town 5w/e 14/02/1953
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 06/11/1954
72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 11/12/1954
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 11/03/1955
71B Bournemouth 7w/e 08/10/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 25/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE ELH Eastleigh 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 30/06/1949
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 9w/e 31/10/1954
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 72C Yeovil Town 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 11/03/1955
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth q/e 08/10/1957
WDN   w/e 25/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 707
Built at Dübs & Co
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30707    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
07/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
11/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30707    

prev prev