Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1658 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15064 Week
» 68080 Month
» 187607 Year
» 3214460 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
708 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
British Railways |
30708 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/12/1957 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 708 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30708 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30708 |
|
|
01/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|