Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 98 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4567 Week
» 5457 Month
» 313438 Year
» 1197819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 726 m/e 10/1899
BR 30726 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 10/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/08/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 59 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 07/10/1950
72B Salisbury 4w/e 05/02/1951
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 06/10/1951
71D Fratton 9w/e 30/06/1952
72A Exmouth Junction q/e 06/06/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 29/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC FRA Fratton 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 31/10/1950
REINS 70D Basingstoke 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 06/06/1958
WDN   w/e 29/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 726
Built at Dübs & Co
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30726    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30726    

prev prev