Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3969 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17375 Week
» 70391 Month
» 189918 Year
» 3216771 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
729 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
British Railways |
30729 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/03/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/11/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
On this date there was no sign of 756, either on shed or in works, so that it may have been broken up. 30253 was renumbered on 5th November, and DS3191 (ex 612) and 30426/7 were being cut up. Other engines in the scrap yard were S282, 30396, 30728/9, 2056, 2067. |
SLS/195201 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 729 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30729 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
06/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30729 |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|