Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 364 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7434 Week
» 4542 Month
» 111488 Year
» 1333053 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 730 m/e 12/1899
BR 30730 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Greyhounds
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 12/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/08/1957
Scrapping During 10/1957
Service Life 57 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 05/02/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 31/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 72B Salisbury m/e 31/08/1950
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton w/e 06/12/1951
WDN   w/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 730
Built at Dübs & Co
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30730    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 30730    

prev prev