Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1053 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18856 Week
» 71872 Month
» 191399 Year
» 3218252 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
732 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
British Railways |
30732 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/10/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
70B |
Feltham |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
71D |
Fratton |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
TOSTORE |
UNK |
|
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
08/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
71D |
Fratton |
8w/e |
03/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
P |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
Locomotives ex Works in late September included: Nos. 35018/25 painted blue, Nos. 30449, 30741, 34061 painted dark green, Nos. 30323, 30730/32, 30905, 32077/86 painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 30458 Ironside, 30840/42, 32085, 90772 are unlined black. In addition to the above, Nos. 35009/17 are painted blue and Nos. 34091-92 are very dark green. |
SLS/194911 |
25/02/1954 |
Brighton Works |
New construction includes Main Line Diesel-Electric 10203 (approaching completion), 80079 (due 12/2), 80080 (due 2/3), 80081 (due 17/3), 80082 (due 1/4). Terrier 32661 has been re-painted, also- 30922, 30545. Other repairs include 30929, 30785, 32133, 32506, 30732, 30285, 15202, 15231, 10000 (nearly ready to leave), 32670, 42104, 30053, 30044. Nos. 76005/6 have been performing indifferently from Brighton on the heavy 8.20 a.m. up and 3.52 p.m. down via Eridge. It had been hoped that these engines might be the answer to the problem of the through Uckfield to London services, but their performances so far has been in no way superior to that of the Class 4 tanks. |
SLS/195404 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 732 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30732 |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
08/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30732 |
|
|