Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17869 Week
» 70885 Month
» 190412 Year
» 3217265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
751 |
m/e |
11/1922 |
British Railways |
30751 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
11/1922 |
ETARRE |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 11/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/06/1957 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
TOSTORE |
70A |
Nine Elms |
5w/e |
08/10/1951 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
8w/e |
13/05/1954 |
TOSTORE |
70A |
Nine Elms |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
REINS |
70D |
Basingstoke |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/06/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1942 |
Sightings |
'D1' tanks 2259 an 2299 were at New Cross recently, the latter being now in its seventieth year (originally 6 Wimbledon). The only 'Remembrance' class not on loan to the G.W.R. is 2333, shed BZ. 4-4-0's 1151 and 1445 are still green with large tender numerals, and the latter replaced a 0-6-2T as one of the East Croydon pilots on 18/12. 4-6-0 498 was recently seen in Temple Meads. There are ten 'King Arthurs' on loan to the L.N.E.R., 739, 740/2/4, 747-751 an 154; they, have been working from Heaton. |
SLS/194302 |
31/03/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops 49, 30352, 30416/54/99, 30501/35/89, 30580 (ex 3506), 698, 30744/51/69, 30864, 30936/56, 32094, 32347, 32608, 34025/9/54/9/61/7/96/7/8. For shops 34055, 35010. Ex shops 30766/72, 34100 (dark green), 30484 (lined black), 30571 (ex 3397), 30306. Scrap: 30122, 154, 408. Noted un-renumbered: 246, 1432. No. 769 had just been renumbered. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 751, name: ETARRE Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30751 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30751 |
|
|
07/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|