Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 141 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3284 Week
» 13454 Month
» 291250 Year
» 1175631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 777 m/e 06/1925
BR 30777 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1925 SIR LAMIEL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Urie / R. Maunsell
Class King Arthur
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 06/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 36 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ELH Eastleigh 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 05/02/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 27/06/1951
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 06/10/1951
70B Feltham 6w/e 14/06/1959
70D Basingstoke 6w/e 05/10/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh 7w/e 03/05/1949
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 70B Feltham P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 6w/e 05/10/1960
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1925 To Service To service as SR Number 777, name: SIR LAMIEL
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30777    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30777    

prev prev