Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 652 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18455 Week
» 71471 Month
» 190998 Year
» 3217851 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
789 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
British Railways |
30789 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
09/1925 |
SIR GUY |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
m/e |
31/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
70D |
Basingstoke |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
TOSTORE |
UNK |
|
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
08/01/1953 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
27/03/1953 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 789, name: SIR GUY Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30789 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30789 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|