|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/04/1951 | Eastleigh Works | Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. | SLS/195106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1925 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 791, name: SIR UWAINE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30791 | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) | ||
13/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
14/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
20/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
16/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
05/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
21/05/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30791 |