Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1014 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14420 Week
» 67436 Month
» 186963 Year
» 3213816 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
792 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
British Railways |
30792 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 792, name: SIR HERVIS DE REVEL Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30792 |
|
|
13/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30792 |
|
|
03/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|