Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4332 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17738 Week
» 70754 Month
» 190281 Year
» 3217134 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
803 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
British Railways |
30803 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 11/1926 |
Withdrawal |
During 08/1961 |
Service Life |
34 yrs , 9 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
AFD |
Ashford |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
8w/e |
06/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
P |
14/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh Works (On Works) |
On Works:- 30028/505/14/38/803/64, 32650/4037/83, 35013/6/25/6/8, 41314/2081, 73028/84, 84021/3, E5005, 20003. Waiting works:- 30055/104/783, 34026/62/6, 35012/5, 42076, 75079; ex-Works:- 30667, 30844, 34044, 35014. |
SLS/195912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 803, name: SIR HARRY LE FISE LAKE Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30803 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30803 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|