Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1806 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19609 Week
» 72625 Month
» 192152 Year
» 3219005 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
804 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
British Railways |
30804 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
King Arthur |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 12/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/02/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
74A |
Ashford |
2w/e |
20/05/1950 |
REINS |
74A |
Ashford |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
74C |
Dover Marine |
q/e |
11/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
P |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1962 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 804, name: SIR CADOR OF CORNWALL Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30804 |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30804 |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|