Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 824 m/e 03/1927
BR 30824 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Urie / R. Maunsell
Class S15
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 03/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/09/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951
70B Feltham m/e 06/01/1964
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 18/01/1965
70B Feltham 4w/e 18/01/1965
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 05/07/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 05/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 29/12/1963
TOSTORE 70B Feltham 4w/e 18/01/1965
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 05/07/1965
WDN   w/e 05/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1927 To Service To service as SR Number 824
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30824    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
05/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 30824    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev