Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 338 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7408 Week
» 4516 Month
» 111462 Year
» 1333027 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 825 m/e 04/1927
BR 30825 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Urie / R. Maunsell
Class S15
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 04/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 8w/e 27/06/1951
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1927 To Service To service as SR Number 825
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30825    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30825    

prev prev