Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 346 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7416 Week
» 4524 Month
» 111470 Year
» 1333035 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 826 m/e 05/1927
BR 30826 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Urie / R. Maunsell
Class S15
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 05/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Scrapping During 01/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 09/10/1950
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1927 To Service To service as SR Number 826
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30826    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30826    

prev prev