Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 796 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5397 Week
» 16944 Month
» 416626 Year
» 493213 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 841   07/1936
BR 30841   09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Urie / Maunsell
Class S15
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 07/1936
Withdrawal During 01/1964
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FEL Feltham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70B Feltham 2w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1936 To Service To service as SR Number 841
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30841    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30841    

prev prev