Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 625 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3311 Week
» 4201 Month
» 312182 Year
» 1196563 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 842 m/e 08/1936
BR 30842 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Urie / R. Maunsell
Class S15
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 08/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/09/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FEL Feltham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70B Feltham 2w/e 31/08/1963
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 18/01/1965
70B Feltham 4w/e 18/01/1965
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 05/07/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 05/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 16/09/1963
TOSTORE 70B Feltham 4w/e 18/01/1965
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 05/07/1965
WDN   w/e 05/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1936 To Service To service as SR Number 842
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30842    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
05/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 30842    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev