Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 167 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 167 Week
» 6301 Month
» 234185 Year
» 1455750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 843 m/e 09/1936
BR 30843 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Urie / R. Maunsell
Class S15
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 09/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sun 20/09/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964
Service Life 28 yrs , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1936
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948
70B Feltham 2w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 20/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction P 02/01/1948
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 20/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/04/1951 Eastleigh Works Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. SLS/195106
18/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. SLS/196204
25/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1936 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 843
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30843    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30843    

prev prev