Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 228 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 228 Week
» 11775 Month
» 411457 Year
» 488044 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 847   12/1936
BR 30847   08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Urie / Maunsell
Class S15
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 12/1936
Withdrawal During 01/1964
Service Life 27 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951
75B Redhill 5w/e 18/07/1959
70B Feltham 4w/e 24/06/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill 5w/e 18/07/1959
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 24/06/1963
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1936 To Service To service as SR Number 847
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30847    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
24/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30847    

prev