Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 850   08/1926
BR 30850   12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/1926 LORD NELSON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Maunsell
Class Lord Nelson
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 08/1926 to Stewarts Lane (BAT)
Withdrawal Sat 18/08/1962 off Eastleigh (ELH)
Total Mileage 1,349,617
Service Life 36 yrs , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane (New) m/e 08/1926
EXJ Exmouth Junction (For trial working the ACE) m/e 03/1930
BAT Stewarts Lane m/e 04/1930
9E Nine Elms 27/02/1940
BM Bournemouth 24/02/1943
ELH Eastleigh 08/01/1949
   Withdrawn 18/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh 8w/e 08/01/1949
WDN   18/08/1962
WDN   w/e 18/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1926 To Service To service as SR Number 850, name: LORD NELSON
Built at Eastleigh Works
Allocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)
   
03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) (For trial working the ACE)    
04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
27/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E)    
24/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30850    
08/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH)    
18/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30850 from Eastleigh (ELH)    

prev