Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14161 Week
» 67177 Month
» 186704 Year
» 3213557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
862 |
m/e |
10/1929 |
British Railways |
30862 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Lord Nelson |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 10/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/10/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NINEELMS |
Nine Elms |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/10/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 862 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30862 |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30862 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|