Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1608 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19411 Week
» 72427 Month
» 191954 Year
» 3218807 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
912 |
m/e |
12/1932 |
British Railways |
30912 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
0000 |
DOWNSIDE |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 12/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
30 yrs , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 912 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30912 |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
11/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
15/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30912 |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|