Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4130 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17536 Week
» 70552 Month
» 190079 Year
» 3216932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
922 |
m/e |
12/1933 |
British Railways |
30922 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 12/1933 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/11/1961 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1954 |
Brighton Works |
New construction includes Main Line Diesel-Electric 10203 (approaching completion), 80079 (due 12/2), 80080 (due 2/3), 80081 (due 17/3), 80082 (due 1/4). Terrier 32661 has been re-painted, also- 30922, 30545. Other repairs include 30929, 30785, 32133, 32506, 30732, 30285, 15202, 15231, 10000 (nearly ready to leave), 32670, 42104, 30053, 30044. Nos. 76005/6 have been performing indifferently from Brighton on the heavy 8.20 a.m. up and 3.52 p.m. down via Eridge. It had been hoped that these engines might be the answer to the problem of the through Uckfield to London services, but their performances so far has been in no way superior to that of the Class 4 tanks. |
SLS/195404 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 922 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30922 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
09/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30922 |
|
|
01/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|