Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
924 |
m/e |
12/1933 |
British Railways |
30924 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Schools |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 12/1933 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/01/1962 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
'Merchant Navy' Class No. 35024 East Asiatic Company was ex Works painted blue, with red lining and carrying the British Railways crest on the tender. Locomotives ex Works during February, painted malachite green included: Nos. 30739, 30797, 30805, 30924, 34031/41/46/50/52 an 35013/29. Locomotives painted black and fully lined included:-Nos. 30673, 32028/79 an 32151, while those painted plain black included Nos. 32022/27. Several 'Schools' were awaiting boilers, which are being constructed at Crewe. |
SLS/194904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 924 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30924 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
23/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
01/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
13/01/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30924 |
|
|