Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 925   04/1934
BR 30925   05/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1934 CHELTENHAM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Maunsell
Class Schools
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 04/1934
Withdrawal Sun 30/12/1962
Service Life 28 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DOV Dover Marine 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
73A Stewarts Lane m/e 10/02/1961
70D Basingstoke 7w/e 23/08/1961
16D Annesley w/e 12/05/1962
   Withdrawn 30/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN STL St Leonards m/e 31/03/1946
REINS 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 08/02/1954
TOSTORE 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 8w/e 23/08/1961
ALLOC 16D Annesley 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 02/06/1962
WDN   30/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1934 To Service To service as SR Number 925, name: CHELTENHAM
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover (DOV)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30925    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
23/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
12/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
30/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30925    

prev prev