Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 926   05/1934
BR 30926   05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
0000 REPTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Maunsell
Class Schools
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 05/1934
Withdrawal Sun 30/12/1962
Service Life 28 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DOV Dover Marine 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 17/06/1950
74B Ramsgate 4w/e 07/10/1950
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 08/12/1950
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
73A Stewarts Lane m/e 10/02/1961
73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961
73A Stewarts Lane m/e 09/11/1961
70D Basingstoke 4w/e 04/01/1962
   Withdrawn 30/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine 3w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC RAM Ramsgate 5w/e 15/10/1949
REINS 74C Dover Marine 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 5w/e 31/10/1950
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate m/e 30/11/1950
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 08/02/1954
TOSTORE 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 09/11/1961
ALLOC 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 04/01/1962
WDN   30/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1934 To Service To service as SR Number 926
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover (DOV)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30926    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
04/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D)    
30/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30926    

prev prev