Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2969 Week
» 20305 Month
» 298101 Year
» 1182482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 928 m/e 06/1934
BR 30928 m/e 07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
0000 STOWE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Schools
Company History SR
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 06/1934
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75A Brighton m/e 09/11/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BTN Brighton m/e 31/10/1946
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 26/09/1947
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 28/05/1949
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 09/11/1961
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1934 To Service To service as SR Number 928
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30928    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30928    

prev prev