Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 85 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3684 Week
» 9818 Month
» 237702 Year
» 1459267 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 957 m/e 08/1929
BR 30957 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Z
Company History SR
Wheels 0-8-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 08/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Scrapping During 12/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1929
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948
72B Salisbury 3w/e 13/10/1958
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 01/05/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 01/05/1959
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/03/1953 Brighton Works No. 80059, the first of ten new 2-6-4 tanks left the works on 3rd March; a further ten are also to be built in this 'year's programme. Engines under and awaiting repair include 30027, 30109, 30825/37, 30338, 30951/7, 32655. 30117 an 30919 have been through shops but have not been repainted. While DS515 was receiving attention here its place at Lancing was taken by 32636; 80060 was due on 2/3 but was not ready. An unusual visitor to the shed on 3rd March was 32113. SLS/195304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1929 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 957
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30957    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
01/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30957    

prev